Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ginn, Deborah, Raynor, Sandra, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fca Us, Llc., Stockton Dodge Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Erin Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by FCA US, LLC.; Stockton Dodge Inc. CM 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received by Deborah Ginn in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 895217. | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by Raynor, Sandra; Ginn, Deborah. CM 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management filed by Raynor, Sandra; Ginn, Deborah. NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney, Spencer P. Hugret, retained for Stockton Dodge Inc . | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Stockton Dodge Inc. MC 050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Blanca Banuelos Assigned. BATCH | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received by Stockton Dodge Inc in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 870060. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney, Elizabeth L Kolar, retained for Stockton Dodge Inc . | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stockton Dodge, Inc. dba Stockton Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram's Answer to Complaint filed by Stockton Dodge Inc. ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.