Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Gonzales, Dennis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hernandez, Felipe, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint alleges that the plaintiff, Dennis Gonzales, was struck and injured by a motor vehicle on or about August 18, 2020, in San Joaquin County, California. The defendants named in the complaint are Felipe Hernandez and fictitious defendants...
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzales, Daniel.
Date: July 20, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Gonzales, Dennis.
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 20, 2022Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gonzales, Daniel.
Date: July 20, 2022Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Gonzales, Dennis.
Date: January 17, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel held on 02/22/2023 09:00 AM .
Date: January 17, 2023Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/17/2023 09:00 AM .
Date: January 17, 2023Tentative Ruling published.
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Continuing Motion to be Relieved of Counsel filed by Gonzales, Dennis.
Date: February 27, 2023Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions as to plaintiff for failure to appear on 10/31/23 and 2/27/24 and failure to request for default, set for 04/25/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CCP 177 5 FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 04/25/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on February 27, 2024. | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 02/27/2024 08:45 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 02/27/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on October 31, 2023. | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/31/2023 08:45 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Reset - Court's Motion | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/31/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed by Gonzales, Dennis. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.