Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Etcheberry, Paul, Etcheberry, Lois, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Elder, Michael Kamal, Elder, Huda, Elder, Chaher, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1713 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courtrooms,42 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courtrooms,42
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement updated 07/02/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer updated 07/02/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service updated 07/02/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
consolidated with lead case CV031432 on 07/02/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.