Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Torcello Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Rausch, David W, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Proof of Service by First -Class Mail -Civil filed by Torcello Lp.
Date: September 21, 2017Assignment of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp.
Date: September 14, 2017Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp.
Date: September 14, 2017Application for Renewal of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp.
Date: September 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
POS030 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service by First -Class Mail -Civil filed by Torcello Lp. Proof of Service Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Bruce E Ramsey, retained for CB Merchant Services .
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $3672.79 filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Assignment of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp. Assignment of Judgment Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
EJ195 NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp. Notice of Renewal of Judgment Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
EJ190 APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Application for Renewal of Judgment filed by CB Merchant Services; Torcello Lp. Application for Renewal of Judgment Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received by CB Merchant Services in the amount of $30.00. Receipt number 209753.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ramsey, Bruce E added as a effective 05/31/2013.
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Torcello LP on 05/30/2013.
Judge: CONVERSION, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.