Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Investment Retrievers, Inc., filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Rabecca Oliveras Aka Rabecca M Olivares Aka Rebecca Monique, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Blanca Banuelos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 04/29/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Blanca Banuelos in Department 10B. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on January 29, 2024. | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/29/2024 08:45 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Investment Retrievers, Inc.. POS030 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by Investment Retrievers, Inc.. CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Rabecca Oliveras aka Rabecca M Olivares aka Rebecca Monique served on 07/01/2023 by Substituted Service. $80.00. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Blanca Banuelos Assigned. BATCH | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Reassigned | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/29/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF JUDICIAL OFFICER BB FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer filed by Rabecca Oliveras aka Rabecca M Olivares aka Rebecca Monique. ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.