Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Lara, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holly, Carter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly, Carter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2015 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1363 days |
Settlement Agreement filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc.
Date: November 10, 2015Case Management Statement filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc.
Date: August 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc. Request for Dismissal Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, Elizabeth Lara Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc. Case Management Statement Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Reassigned
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 12/15/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Settlement Agreement filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc. Settlement Agreement Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, Elizabeth Lara. Judge: CONVERSION, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.