Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Preston, Rachel, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2014 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1887 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Abstract issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 08/26/2014, transaction number 1387847 and receipt number 367766.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status of Rachel Preston updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.