Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc., Flores, Efrain, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Flores, Efrain, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holland, Lesley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolland, Lesley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2010 |
CategoryLimited Civil Auto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full) filed by Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc. on 07/19/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned filed by Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc. on 06/28/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
The status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Manual Notice of Settlement of Entire Case expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Holland, Lesley D. to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (LC) - Court Trial Assignment 2 days scheduled for 03/19/2012 at 01:30:00 PM in 13 was vacated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 02/21/2012 at 03:00:00 PM in 13 was vacated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.