Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Contreras, Brianna Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hernandez, Julio A. Garibay, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Ramirez, Danielle Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Brianna Marie Contreras. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order, Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 04/19/2024 08:15 AM . | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on April 19, 2024. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO Firearm Review, set for 05/10/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Brianna Marie Contreras) *NO POS, set for 05/10/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) returned Unserved as to Julio A. Garibay Hernandez. Costs $50.00 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO Firearm Review, set for 04/19/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Brianna Marie Contreras. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 03/29/2024. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO () *NO POS, set for 04/19/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.