Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Prenger, Rosa Torres, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cascasen, Kyle, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Ramirez, Danielle Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Kyle Cascasen served on 04/02/2024 by Personal Service. $50.00. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 03/29/2024. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Rosa Torres Prenger. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Rosa Torres Prenger) *NO POS, set for 04/19/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed by Prenger, Rosa Torres. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Ex Parte Application. | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.