Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Khan, Sabahat, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Posadas, Miles, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Ramirez, Danielle Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamirez, Danielle Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of DVTRO by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Miles Posadas served on 04/02/2024 by Personal Service. $50.00. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO Firearm Review, set for 04/17/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Sabahat Khan. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 03/27/2024. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Sabahat Khan) *No POS, set for 04/17/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed by Khan, Sabahat. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Ex Parte Application. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.