Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Locke, Patricia Ernesta, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Locke, John Sebastian, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Ramirez, Danielle Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Patricia Ernesta Locke. | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Patricia Ernesta Locke) *Hrg Only* *NO POS, set for 03/13/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on February 2, 2024. | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 02/02/2024 08:15 AM . | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Denied and filed on 01/17/2024. | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Patricia Ernesta Locke. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Patricia Ernesta Locke) *NO POS, set for 02/02/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed by Locke, Patricia Ernesta. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Ex Parte Application. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.