Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gardner, Lauren E. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 1987 |
CategoryPetition For Appointment Of Conservator |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Account & Report
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference contd from 8/24 for status of final account and report Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Account and Report Fourth |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Contact Info for use by Court Investigator | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Attorney's Fees | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Account & Report
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Inventory and Appraisal | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Inventory and Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.