Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ward, Ernestine, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 2/26/21 for status of estate or final account and distribution Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Account & Report
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account Order Settling Final Report, Waiver of Account, Waiver Compensation by Admin, Comp and Cost to Attorney, Final Distribution, |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Examiner Notes | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Notice of Hearing Decedent's Estate | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Decedent's Estate Final Report Waiver of Accounting Final Distribution | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account Final Report, Waiver of Account, Waiver Compensation by Admin, Comp and Cost to Attorney, Final Distribution, |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Stat Rpt&Authorizing Administration to Cont Order Settling First status Report of Administrator; waiver of accounting; allowance of costs to attorney for administrator |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Account & Report
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 1/16/2020 for Status of Estate or Final Account and Distribution Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.