Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Exchange Bank, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 2/25/21 for status of estate or final account and distribution Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Account & Report
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Examiner Notes | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
1st & Final Account and Rpt, Ptn for Final Distribution First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Petition |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 1/23/2020 for Status of Estate or Final Account and Distribution & cont from 7/23/2020 CMC Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Filed STATUS REPORT |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Partial Inventory and Appraisal INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL - PARTIAL #2 CORRECTED |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Partial Inventory and Appraisal INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL - PARTIAL #1 CORRECTED |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Inventory and Appraisal and Partial #3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.