Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mcphee, Bruce Duncan, Mcphee, Douglas Patrick, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Chouteau, Rene A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2018 |
Waiver of Account & Report
Judge: Rosenfield, Arnold D |
||
October 25, 2018 | order for final distribution on waiver of accounting and for allowance of statutory fees to attorneys for ordinary services | ||
September 19, 2018 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
September 07, 2018 | Waiver of Account | ||
September 07, 2018 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
September 07, 2018 |
Probate Pleading Waiver of Statutory Commission for Services |
||
September 07, 2018 | Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account | ||
September 07, 2018 | Notice of Hearing | ||
April 27, 2018 | Final Inventory and Appraisal | ||
February 07, 2018 |
Other Hearing Probate of Will **Emily DeMeo Case** Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.