Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ahmed, Nabeel G, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Gonzales, Antoinette C, Gonzales, Lauren M, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with James R. Baxter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Continuance Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 14, 2019Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: June 10, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: August 16, 2019Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: June 10, 2019Request for Continuance of Small Claims Hearing is Granted
Date: June 25, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: September 18, 2019Claim of Exemption Form Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: November 13, 2019Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of:
Date: August 31, 2022Claim of Exemption Financial Statement Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: June 02, 2020Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: July 27, 2020Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed
Date: May 14, 2019Order determining Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: June 25, 2019Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: July 28, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 04, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: November 08, 2019Motion to Vacate - Small Claims Judgment Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Request for Continuance Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: November 29, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: October 23, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: August 08, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 19, 2021Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Request for Continuance of Small Claims Hearing is Granted
Date: September 18, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 |
Department B1 - Barstow
Judge: Baxter, James R |
||
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Substituted Service |
|
November 03, 2023 |
Department B1 - Barstow
Judge: Baxter, James R |
||
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate - Small Claims Judgment Filed | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted Motion to Vacate |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Action- No Appearance- Response by Judge Granted- Set for Hearing- Please tab this RFA for review before hearing |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Documents Received: Notice of Motion to Vacate |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of: $100.00 from San Bernardino County. Unsatisfied. |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.