Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A-L Financial Corp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Edwards, Deanka L, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with James R. Baxter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Baxter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims ≫ 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 24, 2018Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: February 07, 2020Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: December 19, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: February 07, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 24, 2018Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: September 21, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: September 21, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 07, 2018Document(s) Placed in File
Date: January 04, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 02, 2020Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: July 30, 2018Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: May 03, 2018Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: March 02, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: May 07, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: May 07, 2018Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento
Date: May 29, 2020Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: May 29, 2020Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: October 09, 2020Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of:
Date: January 07, 2021Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: November 24, 2021Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: April 05, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: May 23, 2022Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of:
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of:
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: December 19, 2022Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: February 16, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.