Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cuevas, Hector, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cuevas, Kathryn Ann, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Barbara Phelan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Settlement on the Record 02/17/21 Judge: Phelan, Barbara |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulation & Waiver | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Stip Re: Mutual Waiver of Final Decl of Disclosure | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Service of Dec of Disclosure | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Pleading Release of Notice of Pending Action |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Superior Court, Judicial Officer |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Letter Returning Document Unfiled Envelope # 5799734 Settlement Conference Statement on Pleading; must be submitted on the mandatory judicial counsel form |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Issues for Settlement Conference or Trial (SC) | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.