Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The County Of San Bernardino, County Of Riverside, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, Pro Per, against Bennie A Mcdaniel, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Diane I. Anderson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane I. Anderson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2002 |
CategoryRegistration Of Ca Support Order (Governmental) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
COY OF NTC OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPT ORDER(RIVERSIDE CO ENFORCING HIK1201308) PLACED IN FILE Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 01/27/05 IN DEPT SDA. Not Applicable |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: MOD SUPP FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO - Minutes Pre-D Complete HONORABLE DIANE ANDERSON PRESIDING CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY FATIMA ARRIZA PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. DEFENDANT BENNIE A MCDANIEL PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: THE COURT DOES ACCEPT AND APPROVE ORDER AFTER HEARING. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: HONORABLE DIANE ANDERSON PRESIDING |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: MOD SUPP FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
NOTICE IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE COURT AND TO BRING DOCUMENTS FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DCSS-3 FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 06, 2003 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
September 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.(DA) Not Applicable |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.