Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pflamumer Camila Gonzalez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Miller Steven, against Gonzalez Marcos, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Efrain Matthew Aceves presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions139 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time559 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-02-29 ) | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2016-02-29 ) | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pflamumer, Camila - Filed and Entered on 2016-02-09 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pflamumer, Camila ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 12-17-15 ) | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (See judgment rejection letter - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pflamumer, Camila ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pflamumer, Camila ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.