Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shima Tara, California Public Employees Retirement Sys, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez Martin Ernesto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Efrain Matthew Aceves presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions981 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1030 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department F, Breddan, Matthew A, Presiding Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Matthew A |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Judge Pro Tem/Referee (Matthew St George signed by petitioner - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-26 ) | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:45 AM in Santa Monica Dept. - F, St. George, Matthew, Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Matthew |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hernandez, Martin - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-26 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request - Default Setting (- Hearing Set on 2017-04-26 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.