Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nguyen Leyna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bardavid Julio, against Muriano Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna Maria Luna Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions827 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time842 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service re service of Ex Parte RFO/Proposed Temporary Order | ||
February 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 35 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Request for Order Hearing |
|
February 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 35 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Request for Order Hearing |
|
October 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order - No Fee (Re: Petitiioner's Vocational Evaluation Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 84, Mori, Audra, Presiding Request for Order - Other - Off Calendar - Per Stipulation Judge: Audra |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order (Re: Petitiioner's Vocational Evaluation Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 10, 2020 | Proof of Service - electronic | ||
September 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (electronic ) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 35 Conference - Held - Order Made |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.