Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with James A. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management19 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2001 |
CategoryComplaint For Damages |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions228 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1238 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 05/12/05 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 05/05/05. Not Applicable |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 05/05/05 Not Applicable |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES Not Applicable |
|
October 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: PAY THE SETTLEMENT/DETERMINE ATTY LIENS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA BIJLANI DR - Minutes Off Calendar JUDGE: JAMES A. EDWARDS CLERK: SUSAN MALMBERG REPORTER: KATHY BLYTHE BAILIFF: MIKE CAPES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES S. BRASHER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY ROLAND C. BAINER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PARTIES ADVISE THE MATTER HAS RESOLVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: JAMES A. EDWARDS |
|
October 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
LETTER RECEIVED FROM LLUMCS ATTY DATED 09/11/02 SENT TO JUDGE EDWARDS. Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MONICA BIJLANI DR. Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF JAMES S BRASHER IN SPPT OF MOTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: PAY THE SETTLEMENT/DETERMINE ATTY LIENS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA BIJLANI DR. Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF JAMES J WARNER IN SPPT OF MOTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF ANDREW EDENBAUM FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.