Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vincent O, Edward W, James S, Leonard L, James R, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint case represented by Kiesel Boucher & Larson, against Defendant Doe 4, Defendant Doe 3, Defendant Doe 2, Defendant Doe 1, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Christopher J. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management1183 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2006 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1475 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1475 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NTC OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS SENT TO DEPT S35 REVIEW/PROCESSING Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0012172219 Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
FILING FEE PAID BY DEFENDANT DOE 1 FOR FAX FILING FEE Not Applicable |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT DOE 1. Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL. Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE - Minutes Continued JUDGE: CHRISTOPHER J. WARNER CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON NOT REPORTED - ATTORNEY INFORMATION ATTORNEY R. DOLEN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: CONFERENCE HELD MATTER REMAINS PART OF THE COORDINATION PROCEEDINGS DESIGNATED JCCP4297. A TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED IN THE RELATED BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS WITH TERMS TO BE COMPLETED BY MARCH 2008. MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER REVIEW. REMAND IS POSSIBLE TO STATE COURTS FOR COMPLETION/DISPOSITION OF INDIVIDUAL CASES. - HEARINGS: STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR 04/30/08 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35 COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: CHRISTOPHER J. WARNER |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF 1,2,3,5,6,9,11 CASE MGMT CONF STATEMENT SENT TO DEPT S35 FOR 10/31/07 HRG Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.