Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sb Nissan, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Copeland, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay H Robinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 05, 2023Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: June 28, 2023Bankruptcy Discharge
Date: July 14, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Your writ is being returned. There is an Order of Discharge - Chapter 7 filed on 07/14/2023, stating that 'Creditors cannot collect discharged debts'. Please seek legal assistance as to what the next step is. |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Discharge 6:23-bk-11179-MH |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received BANKRUPTCY NOTICE |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed | |
June 23, 2023 |
Department F7 - Fontana
Judge: Joo, Cecilia H |
||
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Trial proceeds. | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed PERSONAL |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received Bankruptcy docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.