Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Two Jinn Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Matthews, Latosha, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims ≫ 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: February 24, 2023Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: October 31, 2022Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: November 08, 2022Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed
Date: November 08, 2022Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: December 05, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino Mailed in SASE |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of Interest: $50.57 |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received MEMO / WRIT |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed | |
December 02, 2022 |
Department F7 - Fontana
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Trial proceeds. | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Printed | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed Sub Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.