Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zhang, Lei, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Xian, Lu, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Fontana District. The plaintiff, Lei Zhang, is suing the defendant, Lu Xian, for an amount of $9,000. The complaint states that the defendant owes...
Request to Make Payments Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion to Vacate - Small Claims Judgment Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 29, 2022Req for Postponement of Hearing After Service (SC) - CCP 116
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 06, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 06, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 01, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 09, 2022Request to Postpone Trial Filed
Date: December 09, 2022Request for Continuance of Small Claims Hearing is Denied
Date: December 12, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: January 19, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 23, 2023Financial Statements Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Order on Request to Make Payments Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS AS TO LU XIAN |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Please see attached Order on Request to Make Payments |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Make Payments Filed Granted |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Make Payments Filed | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: A REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS HAS BEEN FILED. IF YOU WOULD LIKE TO RESPOND YOU MAY FILE AN ANSWER WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Financial Statements Filed | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Evidence LOOSE DOCS |
|
January 09, 2023 |
Department F7 - Fontana
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.