Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Arneal, Richard G filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brook, Michael J. M., against Babson & Sons Construction, Inc, A California Corporation, International Window Corporation, Reilley, Martin, Thorson, Matt, Matthorson Tile, (total of 10) See All represented by Brook, Michael J. M., Smith, Ted A, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Champlin, Philip A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2001 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
20240411113604783_002_
Date: April 11, 202420240316133051956
Date: March 18, 2024Zeppenfeld_RFJN_Ex_ABCFGH111
Date: January 31, 2024Zeppenfeld_MPA_Opp_Vacate111
Date: January 31, 202420240125072130744
Date: January 25, 2024ZEPPENFELD - RFJN iso Reply
Date: January 24, 2024ZEPPENFELD - Dec of MB iso Reply
Date: January 24, 2024ZEPPENFELD - Objections iso reply
Date: January 24, 2024ZEPPENFELD - Reply
Date: January 24, 2024Zeppenfeld_RFJN_Ex_ABCFGH_2_
Date: January 16, 2024Zeppenfeld_IJH_Dec_Opp_Vacate_2_
Date: January 16, 2024Zeppenfeld_IJH_Dec_Opp_Vacate_2_2
Date: January 16, 2024Zeppenfeld_RFJN_Ex_I_2_
Date: January 16, 2024SCV226091_Notice_of_Ackn_signment_of_Judgment
Date: December 18, 2023REILLEY - Dec of MTR iso Mtn
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - Dec of MJB iso Mtn
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - PAs iso Mtn
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - RFJN iso Mtn
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - Ntc Mtn to Vacate
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - Dec of MB iso Mtn
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY - POS
Date: October 17, 2023REILLEY POS
Date: October 19, 2023REILLEY - POS mail
Date: October 25, 2023REILLEY - POS email
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling Issued on Submitted Matter Re: Defendant Martin Reilley and Third Party Mary Beth Reilley to Vacate |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Also Counsel John Billheimer and CSR Emily Husary |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Matter is taken under submission. Issue: |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Pro Tem Reporter Emily Husary CSR# 12148 |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Vacate To Vacate Judgment; Cont'd from 1/31 Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Vacate Judgment Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice in Oppo to MFJ on the Pleading |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of P&A's in Opposition to MTV Renewed Jdgmt; Dec of I.J. Harris & RJN ISO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.