Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Mendoza, Marc, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Vjb Llc, represented by Mcquilla, Magdalena Ridley, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
Category36: Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
MRM Decl
Date: April 11, 2024NOM
Date: April 11, 2024MPAs
Date: April 11, 2024Order re Def's RA 12-19-23
Date: December 05, 2023Def's CMS 12-19-23
Date: December 04, 2023Def's Ntc of RA 12-19-23
Date: December 04, 2023Order re Def's RA 12-19-23
Date: December 04, 2023MRM M&C Decl
Date: May 24, 2023AMB Decl iso Demurrer
Date: June 23, 2023MRM Decl iso Demurrer
Date: June 23, 2023Ps & As iso Demurrer
Date: June 23, 2023Ntc of Demurrer & Demurrer
Date: June 23, 2023RJN iso Demurrer
Date: June 23, 2023Def's CMS 8-22-23
Date: August 07, 2023Def's Ntc of RA 8-22-23
Date: August 07, 2023Order re Def's RA 8-22-23
Date: August 08, 2023Def's Verified Answer
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 day JT per 12/19 minutes Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | MRM Decl | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOM | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | MPAs | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filed Document Response to Request for Admissions: Truths of Facts Set One & Response to Genuineness of Documents Exhibit Attached |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Panelist: Daniel Raff |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference contd from 8/22 for status after demurrer Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order re Def's RA 12-19-23 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.