Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Harmony Home Improvements, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bleasdell, Steven James, against Cookman, Kevin, Topping, Kelly, represented by Freeman, Richard W., Jr, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2023 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
19W2481-Answer to Cross-Complaint of H
Date: April 05, 202494755Proof00db59
Date: March 27, 2024Exec CMC 3 (4-4-24)
Date: March 25, 202494585Dismi00c058
Date: March 25, 202494575CaseM00d9da
Date: March 25, 202494135Proof00a904
Date: March 18, 202494134Proof00f5f2
Date: March 18, 202494134Proof004b23
Date: March 18, 202491453Summo007909
Date: February 06, 202490890Summo006596
Date: January 29, 202490263Propo009485
Date: January 18, 202489565Cross006072
Date: January 08, 202489564Answe000d79
Date: January 08, 202489250Cross00d9b7
Date: January 02, 202489249Answe002ff6
Date: January 02, 2024Req for Dismissal - 8th Cause of Action
Date: December 16, 2023Complaint for Mechanic's Lien 2.7.23
Date: February 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet 2.7.23
Date: February 07, 2023Revised Summons 2.16.23
Date: February 16, 2023POS of Summons Kevin Cookman 4.5.23
Date: April 06, 2023POS of Summons Kelly Topping 4.5.23
Date: April 06, 2023Exec General Denial
Date: May 05, 2023Exec Cross-Complaint
Date: May 05, 2023Summons
Date: May 05, 20232023.06.07 Pltf HH Demand for Jury Trial and Jury Fees
Date: June 07, 20232023.06.07 Pltf HH CMS (6.22.23)
Date: June 07, 2023Exec CMC (6-22-23)
Date: June 12, 2023Exec CMC 2 (11-2-23)
Date: October 11, 2023Exec First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: October 11, 2023Summons on First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: October 11, 20232023.10.18 Pltf CMS (11.2.23)
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 4/4 for settled pleadings Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 19W2481-Answer to Cross-Complaint of H | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference continued from 11/2/23 CMC for settled pleadings Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Process XC |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 94755Proof00db59 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Late |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Other & first Cause of Action |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Exec CMC 3 (4-4-24) | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 94585Dismi00c058 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 94575CaseM00d9da |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.