Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Long, Robert R., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Henderson, Michael Scott, against Blackmore, Travis, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Dec of MSH ISO (To Be Filed)
Date: April 03, 2024Dec of Plaintiff ISO (To Be Filed)
Date: April 03, 2024Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part B
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part A
Date: March 20, 2024Request for Default Judgment
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of MSH ISO - Part 2
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of MSH ISO - Part 1
Date: March 20, 2024Request for Dismissal of Does
Date: March 20, 2024Judgment
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part D
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part C
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of MSH ISO - Part 4
Date: March 20, 2024Dec of MSH ISO - Part 3
Date: March 20, 2024CMC Statement - 2-27-24 Hearing
Date: February 08, 2024POS of Summons
Date: February 23, 2023Request for Default
Date: May 02, 2023POS for SOD
Date: May 15, 2023CMC Stmt for 6-13-23
Date: May 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 2/27 for confirmation of default judgment Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Dec of MSH ISO (To Be Filed) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Dec of Plaintiff ISO (To Be Filed) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Default Part 1 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Other as to Does 1-100 |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support - Part A | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part B | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Dec of Plaintiff ISO - Part A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.