Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
County Of Sonoma, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gomez, Diana Elaine, against Freitas, Janet M, Freitas, William J, Pierce, Jason, represented by Sax, Richard Phillip, Weaver, Jack W., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Freitas . Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 02, 2024Request for Dismissal Pierce ONLY
Date: March 27, 2024POS notice of settlement and letter
Date: March 26, 20243.26.24 Ltr to Court re vacate trial
Date: March 26, 20243.26.24 Notice of Settlement Pierce ONLY
Date: March 26, 2024Freitas . RJN re Vacate Judgment #2
Date: March 11, 2024Freitas . MEMO re Vacate Judgment
Date: March 11, 2024Freitas . DECL of RS re Vacate Judgment
Date: March 11, 2024Freitas . NOM to Vacate Judgment
Date: March 11, 2024Abstract of Judgment
Date: December 20, 2023NOE Judgment on Pleadings
Date: December 20, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 05, 2023Dec of D Bartels ISO ex parte
Date: January 05, 2023Declaration of IJ
Date: January 05, 2023POS Ex Parte packet
Date: January 05, 2023Notice and Ack William Freitas
Date: February 07, 2023Notice and Ack Jason Pierce
Date: February 07, 2023Notice and Ack Janet Freitas
Date: February 07, 2023Lis Pendens efile
Date: February 09, 2023Answer - General Denial
Date: March 02, 2023Summons (CC)
Date: March 02, 2023Cross-Complaint
Date: March 02, 2023Freitas . Cross Complaint
Date: March 07, 2023Freitas . Answer to Complaint
Date: March 07, 2023Ntc. Ack - WJF
Date: March 07, 2023Ntc. Ack - JMF
Date: March 07, 2023F FAA
Date: March 17, 2023CMC Statement 3-20-23
Date: March 20, 2023Freitas . CMC Statement
Date: March 20, 2023Def.CC Pearce CMS
Date: March 20, 2023Amended Answer
Date: March 21, 2023Freitas . Answer to XComplaint
Date: April 07, 2023CD Pearce Answer to CC
Date: April 05, 2023SIGNED PA FOR MOTION ON JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 20236.20.23 SIGNED DEC JESSE
Date: June 21, 2023RJN EXHIBITS
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE MOTION
Date: June 21, 20236.20.23 DG DEC
Date: June 21, 2023CMS - Pearce
Date: August 07, 2023Freitas . Oppo to MfJotP
Date: November 01, 2023POS Reply Docs
Date: November 03, 2023Decl DG in REPLY to JOP
Date: November 03, 2023Reply to Opposition
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 3 days Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Freitas . Substitution of Attorney | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Other as to Jason Pierce |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Pierce ONLY | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Unconditional Notice of Settlement Entire Notice of Settlement Pierce ONLY; |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Letter to Judge re Vacate Trial |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Motion/OSC | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Reinstatement of Proceedings | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | POS notice of settlement and letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.