Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Cabeza, Sandra, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Bazerkanian, Jack, against Environment Control North Bay, Inc., represented by Kim, Sumy, Thomas, Dominique N, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
Category36: Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
2_Cabeza_Declaration_of_Parte_to_Cont_Trial
Date: April 04, 20241_Cabeza_Def_Environment_ial_Ntc_ISO_Ex_Parte
Date: April 04, 2024Cabeza_Def_Environment_C_cation_to_Cont_Trial
Date: April 04, 202494952STIPU00dd07
Date: March 29, 202494255Subst008287
Date: March 20, 20242022.10.17 Complaint
Date: October 17, 20222022.10.17 Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 20222022.10.17 Summons
Date: October 17, 2022CV-1 - Blank
Date: October 17, 20222023.01.27 POS
Date: February 06, 20232023.02.15 Ps CMS
Date: February 15, 202371431Answe001ebb
Date: February 24, 20232023.02.27 Ps Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: February 28, 20232023.05.26 Ps CMS
Date: May 26, 202376767NOTIC00a927
Date: June 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial est. 7 days (reset per ex parte 4/4/24) Judge: Superior Court, Judicial Officer |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7 days Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial *AMENDED* |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Daum, Elliot Lee |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Continue Trial (emailed to jim-saeteurn@ohaganmeyer.com) |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | 2_Cabeza_Declaration_of_Parte_to_Cont_Trial | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | 1_Cabeza_Def_Environment_ial_Ntc_ISO_Ex_Parte | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Cabeza_Def_Environment_C_cation_to_Cont_Trial | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application For Continue Trial |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.