Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Thompson, Melissa, filed a(n) 02: Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case represented by Bradley, Edwin Lamar, Ii, Shipley, John Leonard, against Board Of Administration For California Public Employees' Retirement System, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2022 |
Category02: Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 05, 20222024_02_27_APP_003_AMEND_tted_Thompson_1_copy
Date: February 27, 20242024_02_08_APP_003_Clerk_anscript_Thompson_1_
Date: February 10, 2024Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet_Thompson_Writ
Date: April 21, 2022Summons_Thompson_Writ
Date: April 21, 2022Writ_Petition_DEADLINE_04_22_Thompson_Writ
Date: April 21, 2022Ntc_of_Assignment_Thompson_Writ
Date: April 21, 2022Association of Counsel (fully executed) 7.12.22
Date: July 12, 20222023_12_27_POS_re_Ntc_of__ned_Thompson_CalPERS
Date: December 28, 20232023_12_27_Ntc_of_Appeal_Thompson_CalPERS_1_
Date: December 28, 2023Donna M. Starr CMC Statement (08-12-2022)
Date: August 12, 2022CMS_Thompson_v_CalPERS_Board
Date: August 17, 2022CalPERS Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: August 30, 2022Donna M. Starr CMS (11-10-2022)
Date: November 11, 2022CMS_Thompson_v_CalPERS
Date: November 21, 20222023_01_11_Opening_Brief_efiled_Thompson
Date: January 11, 2023CalPERS Opposition to Petition
Date: February 24, 2023Reply Brief-Starr
Date: February 24, 20232023_03_27_Thompson_Reply_Brief_Thompson
Date: March 28, 2023Signed-CalPERS Notice of Change of Attorney
Date: May 30, 20232023_08_02_Notice_of_Lod_Record_ThompsonM_1_
Date: August 02, 20232023_08_25_Supplemental_Thompson_1_eb_signed
Date: August 25, 20232023_09_05_RJN_Petition_Dissolution_Thompson
Date: September 05, 2023Supplemental Briefing in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: September 08, 2023AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2023CalPERS Supplemental Reply Brief
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Entry of Order-Signed
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Estimate Worksheet | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Ntc of Estimate for Appellant's Copy of Clerk's Transcript | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Designations of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Amended RT Attached |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_02_27_APP_003_AMEND_tted_Thompson_1_copy | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCA File Number A169479 D1 |
|
February 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_02_08_APP_003_Clerk_anscript_Thompson_1_ | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Designations of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Notification of the Filing of an Appeal/Cross-Appeal | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Document Filed Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.