Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barajas, Obdulia, Hernandez-Barajas, Miguel, Malvaez-Estrada, Maria, Perez-Malvaez, Alexis, Perez-Malvaez, Antony, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Scott D, against Archey, Kasey, Blank, Tatiana, Burlison, Karl, Eden Housing Management, Inc., Hopper, Samantha, (total of 13) See All represented by Minioza, Joseph Jonathan, Sandoval, Servando, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Nadler, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Final_VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2022CV-1
Date: February 22, 2022Perez - Cover
Date: February 22, 2022Final_SDC_Decl
Date: February 22, 2022Sum145W200A
Date: February 22, 2022Sum100W200A
Date: February 22, 2022FINAL W EX - Ex Parte App 917PM
Date: February 24, 2022954 SDC Dec
Date: February 24, 202253905Parti0110cc
Date: February 24, 202253905Proof035b0e
Date: February 24, 202253905Decla029d4b
Date: February 24, 202253905Oppos0045af
Date: February 24, 2022Objections and Reply to Defs Opp
Date: February 25, 202254002Stipu024f2d
Date: February 26, 202254002Oppos00a7ae
Date: February 26, 202254002Decla0190e6
Date: February 26, 202254002Proof033960
Date: February 26, 2022Dismissal - TATIANA BLANK
Date: February 28, 20223230AMDecl SDC App3
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal -MEG-MONIQUE ROE
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - DIANNA MASTROIANNI
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - KASEY ARCHEY
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - ANDREA OSGOOD
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal -LISA RYDHOLM
Date: February 28, 2022330Dec_SILVA_App3
Date: February 28, 2022330[Proposed] Order-App3
Date: February 28, 2022330Decl_OPEREZ_App3
Date: February 28, 2022330Decl_JOSE_App3
Date: February 28, 2022330Decl_ALEXIS_App3
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - L-Mandolini
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - MALISSA ROYBAL
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - KARL BURLISON
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - FELICIA WILLIAMS
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - TAMMY MANNING
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal - SAMANTHA HOPPER
Date: February 28, 2022330AM Ex Parte 3
Date: February 28, 2022POS Cover Page
Date: March 03, 202255265CaseM00d66c
Date: March 24, 2022FNL Ps CMC Statment for 472022
Date: March 25, 2022MPA iso Req For Default
Date: April 07, 2022Form Req For Default 1 2
Date: April 07, 202256067NOTIC02d72c
Date: April 12, 202256067ORDER0450b8
Date: April 12, 202256067MEMOR01b9c3
Date: April 12, 202256067DECLA039d5c
Date: April 12, 202256067PROOF052da4
Date: April 12, 202256067CROSS00f067
Date: April 12, 202256433CaseM009468
Date: April 19, 2022fnl - CMC FOR 5-5-2022
Date: April 20, 2022RFDsml_POS
Date: May 05, 2022RFD_3rdCOA_Only_4292022
Date: May 05, 2022RFD_2ndCOA_Only_4292022
Date: May 05, 202257293Subst003cfd
Date: May 06, 202258065NOTIC004fa9
Date: May 24, 202258723EDENH00c843
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion JOP
Date: June 09, 2022SDC Delc iso Jud_Pldg
Date: June 09, 2022POS
Date: June 09, 2022Req Jud Not
Date: June 09, 2022MPA iso RJP
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Withdrawal Req for Default
Date: June 13, 2022CMS - 62122
Date: June 29, 202260482CaseM0082fb
Date: July 16, 202260482Notic01c6ff
Date: July 16, 202262091Notic00a6ca
Date: August 17, 202262091Decla019bec
Date: August 17, 202263328EXPAR006675
Date: September 13, 2022Opp_Ds Ex Parte
Date: September 13, 202263328PROPO01bc21
Date: September 19, 2022Req for Dismissal
Date: November 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave File an Amended Answer Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference continued from 7/21/22 CMC for settled pleadings Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Pleadings________B
Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave File an Amended Answer Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Req for Dismissal | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | 63328PROPO01bc21 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to shorten time on motion for leave |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Barry, William |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 63328EXPAR006675 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.