Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Miranda, Isabella, Miranda, Marina, Miranda, Wyatt, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dubrovsky, Anna, against Carrera Garcia Transport, Llc, Ceja Madrigal, Mauricio G., Wade Transportation Company, Inc., represented by Bergsten, Robert Troy, Lenkov, Jeffrey Myles, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Pardo, Oscar A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePardo, Oscar A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2022 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
P-Notice.of.Settlement.040224.PK
Date: April 02, 2024LA504315 doc1
Date: March 25, 2024LA504315 doc2
Date: March 25, 2024motion
Date: February 27, 2024Miranda - P MTC - Dec of PK
Date: February 13, 2024Miranda - P MTC - Dec of AD
Date: February 13, 2024Miranda - P MTC - Dec of JC
Date: February 13, 2024Miranda - P MTC - Separate Statement
Date: February 13, 2024Miranda - P MTC - PA
Date: February 13, 2024Miranda - P MTC - Notice Motion
Date: February 13, 2024P_Notice_of_Change_of_Address_040722_PK
Date: April 07, 2022P_CMC_Stmnt_050522
Date: May 05, 2022L_Court_Jury_Fees_050522_PK
Date: May 05, 2022LA286912 Answer & Jury Demand
Date: June 29, 2022LA286912 Ntc of Posting Jury Fees
Date: June 29, 2022P-OPP.MSJ.Evidence.Part.2.112923.PK
Date: November 29, 2023P-OPP.MSJ.Evidence.Part.1.112923.PK
Date: November 29, 2023P-OPP.MSJ.Memo.112923.PK.For.Filing
Date: November 29, 2023P-OPP.MSJ.Sep.Statement.112923.PK
Date: November 29, 2023P_Miranda_CMC_Statement_re_080522
Date: August 06, 2022MIR 220812 REQ FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 12, 2022MIR 220815 SUB OF ATTY
Date: August 16, 2022LA302733.4150570.RA-020 ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: August 18, 2022LA302733.4150571.RA-010 NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: August 18, 2022Miranda - Dfts. CM Statement 08.19.2022
Date: August 19, 2022LA302733.4150570.RA-020 ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: August 24, 2022P_Notice_Association_Executed_100322_PK
Date: October 03, 2022Miranda - P CMS 12-1-22
Date: November 03, 2022LA336115 NTC
Date: November 29, 2022LA336089.4495863.Miranda_Dfts Mtn Leave File CC
Date: November 29, 2022Miranda - P Notice of Change of Address
Date: December 05, 2022P_OPP_Motion_For_Leave_t_cl_Krepkiy_021523_PK
Date: February 15, 2023P_Opp_Mot_Leave_File_CC_021523_PK
Date: February 15, 20232023-02-21 Miranda_Mtn Leave File CC_Reply
Date: February 22, 2023NRA
Date: February 25, 2023PO
Date: February 25, 2023PO
Date: February 28, 2023LA413347 -comp
Date: June 30, 2023LA413347 -decl
Date: June 30, 2023LA413347 -ss
Date: June 30, 2023LA413347 -mtn
Date: June 30, 2023Miranda_EPA to Continue Trial (combined)
Date: July 28, 2023Sullivan Decl (combined)
Date: July 28, 2023Order (combined)
Date: July 31, 2023Miranda - P OPP to D Ex Parte to Continue Trial
Date: July 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7-10 day JT per 12/1 minutes Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Bifurcate
Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Conditional Notice of Settlement Entire | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | P-Notice.of.Settlement.040224.PK | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response to Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel M.G. Ceja Madrigal to Provide Further Written Discovery Responses |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Written Discovery Responses |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | LA504315 doc1 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | LA504315 doc2 | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion TO BIFURCATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.