Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Villa Rosa Homeowners Association, filed a(n) 16: Unlimited Fraud case represented by Bernate, Nicholas Jaime, against Baker, Kellin A, Commonwealth Association Management, Inc., Cooper, Chad W., Cooper, Vallen W., Vallen W. Cooper, Cpm, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Erlach, Raymond Nicholas, Stella Erlach, Raymond N., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
Category16: Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Villa_Rosa_CMS_1_31_22
Date: February 01, 2022strikemotion2.p&a
Date: February 08, 2022strikemotion2.not
Date: February 08, 2022judicialnot2.reqExs1to5
Date: February 08, 2022strikemotion2RE.decExs8to9
Date: February 08, 2022strikemotion2RE.dec2Exs6to7
Date: February 08, 2022strikemotion2proof.not
Date: March 17, 2022Compromise998Accept_VWC
Date: May 02, 2022Compromise998Accept_CWC
Date: May 02, 2022Compromise998Accept_KAB
Date: May 02, 2022clerk.l1
Date: May 04, 2022strikemotion2proof.contin
Date: May 13, 2022Compromise998Accept.KABPrf
Date: May 13, 2022Compromise998Accept.CWCPrf
Date: May 13, 2022Compromise998Accept.VWCPrf
Date: May 13, 2022Compromise998Accept.CWCpj
Date: May 17, 2022ProposedJudgmentVWC
Date: May 17, 2022Compromise998Accept.KABpj
Date: May 17, 2022ProposedJudgmentKAB
Date: May 17, 2022ProposedJudgmentCWC
Date: May 17, 2022Compromise998Accept.VWCpj
Date: May 17, 2022changeaddress.not
Date: June 06, 2022CMS20220628
Date: June 11, 2022dollard.l1
Date: June 11, 2022CMS_of_Plaintiff_6_28_22
Date: June 13, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Judgment_Vallen_Cooper
Date: June 24, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Judgment_Chad_Cooper
Date: June 24, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Judgment_Kellin_Baker
Date: June 24, 2022Decl_of_NJB_ISO_Opp_to_Motion_to_Strike
Date: July 07, 2022Opp_to_Motion_to_Strike_v_2
Date: July 07, 2022JudgmentSatisAcknowVWC
Date: July 08, 2022JudgmentSatisAcknowKAB
Date: July 08, 2022JudgmentSatisAcknowCC
Date: July 08, 2022strikemotion2.rep
Date: July 13, 2022Dismissal_VWC_CPM_INC_and_CAM_INC
Date: July 26, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Dismissal
Date: August 01, 2022dismissal.not
Date: August 04, 2022MemorandumCosts
Date: August 16, 2022feescostsmem.p&a
Date: October 01, 2022feescostsmot.decExhs1to4
Date: October 01, 2022feescostsmem.not
Date: October 01, 2022feescostsmemproof.notEx1
Date: October 21, 2022Opposition_2
Date: January 26, 2023Decl_of_NJB_ISO_Opp_to_M_or_Attys_Fees_SIGNED
Date: January 26, 2023Ellecamp_Decl
Date: January 26, 2023RFJN
Date: January 26, 2023POS
Date: January 26, 2023feescostsmem.rep
Date: February 02, 2023feescostsmem.sup
Date: March 07, 2023Decl_of_PCD
Date: March 06, 2023FINAL_NJB_Decl
Date: March 06, 2023Defendants_Resp_to_Court_Questions
Date: March 06, 2023POS
Date: March 06, 2023feescostsmemsup.objEx1
Date: March 07, 2023Notice_of_Entry_of_Order
Date: May 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Entry_of_Order | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ruling Issued on Submitted Matter Order on Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oral Argument Set per 2/10/23 Ruling for further argument limited to the Courts questions Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter is taken under submission. Issue: |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
March 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | SCV-267991, Villa Rosa Homeowners Association v Cooper Appearances required. | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objections to Evidence Defendant Vallen W. Cooper objections to plaintiffs presentation of new evidence after submission. |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | feescostsmem | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | feescostsmemsup.objEx1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.