Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Walters, Heath, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Cello, David L., against Sanitation Services, Inc., represented by Cheng, Gregory C, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Wick, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWick, Arthur A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 |
Jury Trial 5 days; if jury fees are posted by 6/18/21 (otherwise, court trial) Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
||
January 24, 2022 | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | ||
January 24, 2022 |
Filed Document Unconditional Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
||
June 14, 2021 |
Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Trial Only |
||
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Wick, Arthur A |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement LATE |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - 30 Days Summons and Complaint | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint 1st Amended Complaint; Does 1-20 |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - 30 Days Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.