Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Honchariw, Nicholas, Honchariw, Nicholas And Sharon, Honchariw, Sharon, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Fjm Capital Inc, Fjm Capital, Inc., Fjm Management, Llc, Fjm Private Mortgage Fund, Llc, represented by Sichi, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Daum, Elliot Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaum, Elliot Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
Category11: Unlimited Petition Re:Arbitration Award |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
20240112 Respondents Ntc Elect Use Appendix
Date: January 13, 2024ABSTRACT..001.FILING COPY
Date: April 20, 2022App003 Filed 12 29 2023 Scanned
Date: December 29, 2023POS 12 15 2023
Date: December 16, 2023Notice of Appeal 12 11 2023
Date: December 11, 2023Costs App Memo 1 5 2023
Date: January 05, 202320230126 Sub Attorney - FJM Management
Date: January 27, 202320230126 Sub Attorney - FJM Private
Date: January 27, 202320230126 Sub Attorney - FJM Capital
Date: January 27, 202320230127 Obj Proposed Judgment
Date: January 27, 202320230202 Supp. Obj Proposed Judgment
Date: February 02, 2023Proposed Order 2 2 2023
Date: February 02, 202320230207 Obj Proposed Judgment of 2-2-23
Date: February 07, 2023Proposed Judgment 1 11 2023
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of judgment filed 2 12 2023
Date: February 12, 202320230216 Ntc Int to Vacate Judgment
Date: February 17, 202320230227 Sichi Dec ISO Mtn to Vacate
Date: February 28, 202320230227 Mtn to Vacate Jmt or New Trial
Date: February 28, 2023POS 3 3 2023
Date: March 03, 2023Decl of NH in Opp to motion to vacate judgmen
Date: March 03, 2023Opp to motion to vacate judgment 3 2 2023
Date: March 03, 202320230308 Reply re Motion to Vacate
Date: March 09, 202320230315 Ex Parte to Adv Mtn Vacate
Date: March 15, 202320230314 Proposed Order
Date: March 16, 2023Opposition to ex parte motion 3 16 2023
Date: March 16, 202320230316 Ntc Ruling re Ex Parte App
Date: March 17, 2023sub 1
Date: April 04, 2023sub 2
Date: April 04, 2023sub 3
Date: April 04, 202320230501 Proposed Order
Date: May 05, 2023Decl NH Fee 6 7 2023
Date: June 07, 2023POS 6 7 2023
Date: June 07, 2023Fees memo 6 7 2023
Date: June 07, 2023Notice of motion for fees 6 7 2023
Date: June 07, 202320230907 Sichi Dec ISO Opp to Fee Motion
Date: September 08, 202320230907 Resp to Atty Fee Motion
Date: September 08, 202320230907 RJN
Date: September 08, 202320230907 Supp. Sichi Dec ISO Opp to Fee Motion
Date: September 08, 2023Fee supp declaration NH 9 13 2023
Date: September 13, 2023Attorneys fees reply memo 9 13 2023
Date: September 13, 2023Attorneys fees supp memo 10 9 2023
Date: October 10, 202320231009 Resp. Supp Brief in Opp to Fee Motion
Date: October 10, 2023Change of address 12 2022
Date: December 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing / Transmittial of Record on Appeal | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate Regarding Appendix | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Estimated Cost to Prepare Reporter's Transcripts $27.00 + $50.00 Admin |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Register of Actions | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCA File Number A169447 D3 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to Reporters to Prepare Estimate | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Estimated Cost to Prepare Reporter's Transcripts | |
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 20240112 Respondents Ntc Elect Use Appendix | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Designations of Appendix for Appeal Respondent's Notice Electing to Use an Appendix |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.