Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Heida, Andrew, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Roth, Gary Barkley, against Cotati-Rohnert Park Unified School District, Emerald Education Specialists, Llc, Tauaefa, Rose, represented by Edson, Mark Perry, Peters, Mark D, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Wick, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWick, Arthur A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Trial Orders of the Court and Procedural Stips
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's MIL No. 1
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's MIL No. 2
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's MIL No. 3
Date: August 31, 2022[Proposed] Statement and Length of Trial
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's MIL No. 4
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's Trial Brief
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's Witness List
Date: August 31, 2022[Proposed] Jury Instructions
Date: August 31, 2022Plaintiff's Exhibit List
Date: August 31, 2022[Proposed] Jury Questionnaire
Date: August 31, 2022[Proposed] Verdict Form
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_JOINT_NEUTRAL_STMT
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_JOINT_EST_TRIAL_TIME
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_JOINT_LIST_WITNESSES
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_CRPUSD_TRIAL_BRIEF
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_MIL_TO_XCLUDE_DESC
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_TRIAL_ORDERS_COURT
Date: August 31, 2022HEIDA_DEFT_LIST_PROPOSED_CACI_INSTNS
Date: August 31, 202262849Trial002abc
Date: September 01, 202262849Trial024bb4
Date: September 01, 202262849Filed01eb03
Date: September 01, 202262941EMERA019199
Date: September 02, 202262941EMERA000018
Date: September 02, 202262941OPPOS02ed5e
Date: September 02, 202262941OPPOS03a18e
Date: September 02, 2022HEIDA_CPRUSD_s_JOINDER_I__ES_s_OPP_TO_MIL_NO_1
Date: September 07, 2022HEIDA_CPRUSD_s_MPAs_IN_OPP_TO_MIL_NO_2
Date: September 07, 2022HEIDA_CRPUSD_s_MPAsIN_OPP_TO_MIL_NO_3
Date: September 07, 2022HEIDA_CPRUSD_s_MPA_s_IN_OPP_TO_MIL_NO_4
Date: September 07, 2022HEIDA_TRIAL_EXHIBIT_LIST
Date: September 08, 2022Petition for Approval of Minor Compromise
Date: September 13, 2022POS re Petition for Approval of Compromise
Date: September 13, 2022Ntc of Entry of Order 10.25.22 - Heida
Date: October 25, 202273143Dismi007e99
Date: March 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 73143Dismi007e99 | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Ntc of Entry of Order 10.25.22 - Heida | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling Re: Order Approving Compromise of Claim |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Claim Filed | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Minor's Claim
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Minor Compromise | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | POS re Petition for Approval of Compromise | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Motion/OSC Proof of Service RE Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.