Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ahlers-Scott, Janine, Beato, Barbara, Candelario, Lynne, Coffey, Harry, Coffey, Judith, (total of 37) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harlan, Richard Christian, against Farmers Group, Inc., A Nevada Corporation, Farmers Insurance Exchange, A California Reciprocal Insurer, And Exchange Of The Farmers Insurance Group Of Companies, Fire Insurance Exchange, A California Reciprocal Insurer, And Exchange Of The Farmers Insurance Group Of Companies, Fire Underwriters Association, Midcentury Insurance Company', (total of 5) See All represented by Wagner, Christopher Robert, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2018 |
Category37: Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
53684Stipu00664e
Date: February 18, 202270957Dismi014007
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi007059
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi04183b
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi02f005
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi03e826
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi06a04d
Date: February 15, 202370957Dismi053e2d
Date: February 15, 202378836Condi001171
Date: July 12, 202379904Dismi00dec1
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | 79904Dismi00dec1 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Reinstatement of Proceedings | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 78836Condi001171 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Conditional Notice of Settlement Entire | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70957Dismi014007 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70957Dismi007059 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70957Dismi04183b | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70957Dismi02f005 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70957Dismi03e826 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.