Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Floyd, Victor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Guerrero, Anai Cuevas, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Hardcastle, Allan D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2018 | Order and Notice of Entry of Dismissal | ||
June 28, 2018 |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal
Judge: Hardcastle, Allan D |
||
April 19, 2018 | Order to Show Cause re Dismissal | ||
April 19, 2018 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Hardcastle, Allan D |
||
April 03, 2018 |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel |
||
March 28, 2018 | Order on Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel | ||
March 28, 2018 |
Motion to Withdraw
Judge: Hardcastle, Allan D |
||
March 28, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
The Brandi Law Firm’s Motion for be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED. Unless this tentative ruling is contested, the Court will sign the Proposed Order lodged with the motion.
Judge: Allan D. Hardcastle |
|
February 09, 2018 |
Proof of Service of Motion/OSC re: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel |
||
February 07, 2018 |
Motion to Withdraw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.