Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Allen, Johnna filed a(n) Civil case against Lima, Jolynn, Michael Tillman Trust, Dated May 29, 2003, Tillman, Jeremy, Tillman, Michael, represented by Baxter, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 3-4 day CT Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Important Notice Regarding Trial |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Other | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Substituting Party |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation For Substitution of XC Party |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order RE: continuing trial |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Re-Setting Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.