Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abodeely, James, Abodeely, Piper, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perry, Leslie R, against Fazio, Joe, Fazio, Peter, Fazio, Shari, Sonoma Property Holdings Llc, represented by Lettunich, Martin Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 |
Case Management Conference cont from 3/10/2020 for Settled Pleadings Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
||
May 18, 2020 | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | ||
April 15, 2020 | Unconditional Notice of Settlement Entire | ||
March 10, 2020 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
||
February 25, 2020 |
Case Management Statement LATE |
||
February 25, 2020 |
Proof of Service of Filed Document Electronic Service: Case Management Statement |
||
February 24, 2020 |
Case Management Statement Plaintiff's CMC Statement |
||
February 24, 2020 | Case Management Statement | ||
February 04, 2020 |
Notice of Lien Attorney's Lien |
||
November 06, 2019 | Notice of Rescheduled Judicial CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.