Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robinson, Ron, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Glaubiger, Ethan A, against Arshi, Ben, Juan, Beverly, Unicorn Properties, represented by Lewis, Scott Adrian, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Chouteau, Rene A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2016 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2019 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Filed Full |
||
April 25, 2019 |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling Granting Motion of Plaintiff's for Attorney's Fees |
||
April 24, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff’s motion for attorney fees is GRANTED. This action involves the sale of real property which unfolded via multiple transactions. However, not all the agreements at issue in the case contained...
Judge: Rene A |
|
April 24, 2019 |
Order Granting Motion of Plaintiff for Attorney Fees Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
||
April 24, 2019 |
Motion of Plaintiff for Attorney's Fees Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
||
April 10, 2019 |
Motion of Plaintiff for Attorney's Fees Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
||
April 08, 2019 |
Stipulation & Order To Continue Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees |
||
March 29, 2019 |
Motion of Plaintiff for Attorney's Fees Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
||
March 22, 2019 | Reply Memo of P&A in Support | ||
March 18, 2019 | Memorandum of P&A's in Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.