Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California, State Of, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Sonoma County District Attorney, against Perryman, Calvin Dennis, Jr, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Peter K. Ottenweller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryMental Competency - Pc 1368 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Report Filed Dr. Goldberg's Report dated 1/28/21 |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant found mentally competent | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC 1368 Mental Competency Hearing Dr. Goldbergs report due 01/28/2021 Judge: Ottenweller, Peter |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Criminal Proceedings Reinstated | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received - Confidential Dr. Goldberg per 1368 |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Ottenweller, Peter |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Doctor's Report Due; Appointment pursuant to Appt per PC 1368 |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Nakahara, Vernon K |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Doctor appointed to examine defendant Dr. Aryeh Goldberg Judge: Nakahara, Vernon K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.