Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Atwater, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Barragan, Hector, Rachel And Hector Salon & Bowtique, Sanchez, Rachel, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Brian L. McCabe presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Time To Trial33 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time265 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Suspend Status | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Baysinger, Robert F. |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.