Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Don Roberto Jewelers Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Sanchez, Esteban, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2012 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Time To Trial45 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption
Judge: Griffin, John E., Junior |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Claim - Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.