Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Laymon, Linda, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Wisdom, Louise, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Flanagan, Hugh M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFlanagan, Hugh M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2012 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Time To Trial33 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Document: Other | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.